Shortcuts In Multiplication : Multiplying Two-digit Numbers By 11

SHORTCUTS IN MULTIPLICATION

Multiplication of Two-digit Numbers By 11

Case One : If the sum of the digits is less than ten

Example one : 34 * 11 = 374

The first digit of the product is also the first digit of the factor to be

Multiplied by 11.

The third digit of the product is the second digit of the factor to be

Multiplied by 11.

The middle digit of the product is the sum of the digits of the factor to

Be multiplied by 11.

Example two : 36 * 11 = 396

Example three : 42 * 11 = 462

Example four : 63 * 11 = 693

Example five : 45 * 11 = 495

Case Two : If the sum of the digits is greater than ten

Example One : 78 * 11 = 858

The first digit of the product is the first digit of the factor to be

Multiplied by 11 increased by one.

The third digit of the product is the second digit of the factor to be

Multiplied by 11.

The middle digit of the product is the second digit number of the sum

Of the digits of the factor to be multiplied by 11.

Example two : 39 * 11 = 429

Example three : 59 * 11 = 649

Example Four : 79 * 11 = 869

Example Five : 85 * 11 = 935

More by this Author

• 5

Solving Investment Problems One of the most important applications of linear equations is found in solving investment problems. Investment problems use the Simple Interest formula I = Prt, where P =...

• 108

TOPIC: PROBLEM SOLVING INVOLVING RATIONAL EQUATION FEATURING: WORK PROBLEM MOTION PROBLEM TOPIC OBJECTIVES: At the end of the lesson the students are expected to: 1. Gain skill in solving...

• 4

Solving Word Problems Involving Chebyshev’s Theorem Chebyshev’s Theorem states that the proportion or percentage of any data set that lies within k standard deviation of the mean where k is any...

6 years ago

Wow very cool! Thanks!!!

abhilash reddy 6 years ago

simply superb!!!!

nice work