Shortcuts On Squaring Two-Digit Numbers Part One

 

SHORTCUTS  ON SQUARING TWO-DIGIT  NUMBERS  Part One

 

A.      Squaring  2-digit  number  ending in one

Example One :    Square  51

Step One :    Take a two-digit  number ending in 1, then subtract 1 from it.

                        51 – 1  =   50

Step  Two :   Square the difference

                       50  *   50   =   2500

Step Three :   Double the difference in step one  1 and add it to the square in step two              

                                       2500 + 100  =  2600

               Step Four  :    Add   1 to the sum in step three

                                        2600 +  1  =  2601

                                      Therefore  51 * 51  =  2601

 

             Example two :  Square the number  71

             Step one :    71 –  1  =  70

             Step two  :   70   *   70   = 4900

             Step three :      4900 + 140   =   5040

             Step four :           5040 + 1 =  5041

                Therefore             71 * 71  =   5041

 

B.      Squaring a 2-digit number ending in 2

Example One :  Square  62

Step One : Take a two-digit number ending in 2. If the number is 62, the last digit in the square

 is 4 .      _  _ _ 4

Step two : Multiply the first digit by 4 =è    6 * 4   =   24

The second digit in the produc t will be the next to the last digit  in the square. Keep any carry.

                            _ _ 4 4

Step three:  Square the first digit and add the number carried from the previous step.

                           6 * 6   = 36

                           36 + 2 =  38

Threfore the square of 62  is  3844

Example two :   Square 72

First step   :  2 * 2  = 4

Second step :   7 * 4  =  28    =è                _ _ 84

Third  step  : 7 * 7  = 49   ==è    49 + 2   =   51

         Therefore   72 * 72  =   5184

 

C.      Squaring  a  2-digit number ending in 3.

Example one :  Square 53

Step one : Take a two-digit number ending in 3. The last digit of the square will be 9.

Step two : Multiply the first digit by 6. The second digit in the product will be the next number to

                  The last digit in the square . Keep any carry.

                   5  *  6  =   30

                      _ _  0 9

Step three : Square the first digit and add the number carried from the previous step .

                           5  *  5   =  25

                          25  +   3   =  28

            Therefore     53 * 53   =   2809

 

Example two :  Square  83

Step one :   3 * 3  = 9

Step two :  8 * 6  =  48

                    _  _ 8 9

Step three :  8 * 8 = 64

                        64 + 4 =   68

Therefore 83 * 83  =  6889

 

SOURCE :   MATH POWER by Divina Gracia T. Bandong.  

        

 

                      

                          

               

 

More by this Author


Comments 1 comment

empeen profile image

empeen 7 years ago from India

Good one, useful one, but I think in CASE I, two digit number ending with one, it is easier if we use

(a + b)2 =a2 + b2 + 2.a.b

    Sign in or sign up and post using a HubPages Network account.

    0 of 8192 characters used
    Post Comment

    No HTML is allowed in comments, but URLs will be hyperlinked. Comments are not for promoting your articles or other sites.


    Click to Rate This Article
    working