ArtsAutosBooksBusinessEducationEntertainmentFamilyFashionFoodGamesGenderHealthHolidaysHomeHubPagesPersonal FinancePetsPoliticsReligionSportsTechnologyTravel

More On ShortCuts In Multiplication

Updated on August 17, 2009

MORE ON SHORTCUTS IN MULTIPLICATION


>

Multiplying Two Numbers Whose Sum of Their Last Digits is 10  and Their Other Digits are the Same


>

Example One :  34  X   36


>

Solution by steps :


>

1)  Multiply the first digit by one more than itself  :   3 X  4   =  12


>

2)  Multiply the last digits  :     4  X  6   =     24


>

3)  Combine the answer            1224


>

Short way   :     3 X 4   =  12,     4  X    6   =   24     Answer:   34  X   36   =   1224


>

Multiplying Two 2-digit Numbers Whose Sum of Their First Digits is Ten  and Their Last Digits are the Same


>

Example  One :      64  X  44


>

Solution   by steps :


>

1) Multiply the first digits and add a last digit:  (6 X  4 )  = 24  +  4   =   28


>

2)  Multiply the Last digits :   4 X  4  =   16


>

3) Combine : 2816


>

Short way  :   6 X 4 + 4  = 24 + 4 = 28,   4 X 4  =   16


>

Answer  :      64  X  44  =  2816


>


>

Try for yourself the following items using shortcut :


>

1)    35   X   75


>

2)    43   X    47


>

3)    86    X   26


>

4)     52   X   58


>

5)      39   X   79

Answers  :


>

1)  2625    2)  2021    3)  2236   4)  3016  5)  3081


>

SOURCE :


>

21ST CENTURY MATHEMATICS 6

Comments

    0 of 8192 characters used
    Post Comment

    • Moon Daisy profile image

      Moon Daisy 7 years ago from London

      Wow, that's great! I've never come across those before and would love to find out why they work. Maybe if I have time I'll try to work it out! :o)

      Thanks, the shortcuts may come in handy with any future maths teaching that I do.

    • cristina327 profile image
      Author

      cristina327 7 years ago from Manila

      Hi Moondaisy. It is nice to hear from you again. Regards.

    • profile image

      john 7 years ago

      44*12

      Look at the left side of the equation and think 4 x 1 is 4.

      Keep this number in your head.

      Next add up the digit 1 and 2 and think, 3 x 4 is 12. Combine the numbers 4 with the 1 in 12. Think 52, this is the partial answer.

      End with 4 x 2 is 8. Place the 8 at the end of 52, for the answer 528

      With practice you will be able to do this in seconds.

      Of course for multiplying by 12 you could always just write down the first digit. (4) Double the same digit and add the rightmost number. 8+4=12. Carry the one to the first number for 52, and double and place the last digit (8). 528.

      Or, you could double the entire number (44) to 88. Carry the 8 to 44 for 52, and place the 8. 528.

    • profile image

      Jones 7 years ago

      I solved every problem, it works GREAT! thanks a lot for your work.

    • profile image

      kishore 6 years ago

      Its not working for some problems like

      52*58, 62*72 , 63*53 and some other problems.

      Please help me.

    • profile image

      bindiya Vig 6 years ago

      i knw left multiplication only thanks for rhs mul

    • profile image

      braica 6 years ago

      thanks a lot

    • profile image

      Sexy 6 years ago

      like it

    • profile image

      jacob 5 years ago

      i don't get how you got the answers at the bottom

    • profile image

      lucky 5 years ago

      super

    • profile image

      shankar 5 years ago

      niceeeee

    • profile image

      Somasis Mondal 5 years ago

      it's a nice procedure...can u tell me short cut multiplication procedure of (3215*135)....please help me...

    • profile image

      priyam 5 years ago

      how to calculate 999*99*9 shortly......pls rply

    • profile image

      rameshwar 4 years ago

      it is super

    • profile image

      roeun 4 years ago

      how do we multiply this by shortcut way

      9876*6742

    • profile image

      sherrywin 4 years ago

      salamats po//...

      ")))

    Click to Rate This Article