ArtsAutosBooksBusinessEducationEntertainmentFamilyFashionFoodGamesGenderHealthHolidaysHomeHubPagesPersonal FinancePetsPoliticsReligionSportsTechnologyTravel

Vedic Mathematics - Fast and Quick Multiplication techniques - Part 1

Updated on August 5, 2012
Multiplication made easy
Multiplication made easy

Quick Multiplication Techniques

Vedic Mathematics is a magical method of fast calculation. This wonderful tool has been developed on the basis of Ancient Indian principles. Students still find difficulty in calculation and have fear of it. So in order to do Calculation easy and fast, Vedic Mathematics is helpful tool today. This Method helps students to do calculation with increased Speed rate without use of calculators. It is also helpful in competitive examination such as MBA/CAT and finally will take you to success.

Faster Multiplication:-

  • Multiplying 2-digit numbers by 2 digit numbers.
  • Multiplying 3-digit numbers by 3 digit numbers.

Let us consider example.

1.Example

75

x

75

--------------

375

+ 3750 ------(Normal way of Calculation)

--------------

5625

-------------

As above, is a normal way to calculate 2digit number by 2digit numbers. Let us do it using Vedic Mathematics.

2. Example

65

x

65

------------

4225

------------

Explanation of Multiplication using Vedic Mathematics is as follows:-

  • We multiply 5 multiply by 5 and put 25 as right-hand side of the answer.
  • We added 1 to the top left digit 6 to make it 7.
  • We then multiplied it ( 7 ) by the bottom left digit 6 and got 42, which is the left-hand side of the answer.
  • We got the correct answer 4225.

Similarly we can multiply 15 by 15, 25 by 25, 35 by 35 etc.This formula is not limited to same number or ending with 5. We can apply this formula to multiply a good number of two-digit and three digit numbers.

Pre-condition

  • Left-Hand digit should be the same and the total of right-hand digits should be 10.

Lets us take another example:

76

x

74

------------

5624

-----------

In this example the left-hand digits are the same –i.e. 7, and the total of the right-hand digits is 10. So we can apply this formula here. Similarly just have a look at following.-

79

x

71

----------

5609 ---- (note to put 09 not only 9 as we are multiplying 2 digit numbers)

----------

Multiplying three-digit numbers by three-digit numbers.

Having done this for two digit numbers, we can extend the same formula to the three-digit numbers.

  • In the case of three-digit numbers the first two digits on the left should be the same and the total of the digits on the right should be 10.

Let us take an example:

125

x

125

----------

15625

-----------

The steps will be:

  • Multiply 5 by 5 and keep 25 on the right-hand side.
  • Add 1 to 13 by 12 and put 156 on the left-hand side.
  • The answer is 15625.

Applications:

The utility of this formula is wide. You can use this formula to multiply two-digit numbers then the first digits are same, but the total of the last digit does not come to ten then? Consider example as 77 x 75??

77 x 75 can be written as (75+2) x 75 and from the formula we know to calculate 75 x 75=5625

  • Further we required to add 2 x 75=150 to 5625.
  • The answer is 5625+150=5775.

Similarly we can work out with 77 x 74, 64 x 68 etc. Up to this we have worked with those numbers whose first digits were same and the total of the last digits exceeded 10. Now consider the example of 47 x 42

In this case 47 x 42, our first digits are same (4) but the total of last two digits is less than 10.

47 x 42 = 47 x (43-1) = 2021- 47 =1974.

Isn't this an easier method of multiplication? Watch out for my Part 2 on this series for more on multiplying numbers.

Comments

    0 of 8192 characters used
    Post Comment

    • profile image

      Kevin shah 12 months ago

      Very useful

    • profile image

      Happy singh☺ 2 years ago

      It is the ''mast jhakass jabarjast'' process I have seen ever ☺☺☺☺☺☺!!¡¡!!¡¡.☺.☺.☺.☺.

    • profile image

      Guest 2 years ago

      Six years of comments and nobody seems to have noticed the error in the "normal calculation" of 75 x 75 in the very first example. Learn your tricks for the special cases if you want, but they are no substitute for doing the steps correctly whatever method you choose.

    • profile image

      santu 2 years ago

      it's so nice - This is a very simple and works exactly Vedic Mathematics terribly early .A simple method of identifying who gave me and I love him vedic maths..!!

    • profile image

      Sahaj 3 years ago

      Very nice

    • profile image

      kanhaiya 3 years ago

      i like it ;

      outstanding,.

    • profile image

      arbaz 3 years ago

      I like it this tecniq

    • profile image

      supriya 3 years ago

      I like this tecniques very thanksfor giving this methodological.

    • cbl12 profile image

      cbl12 3 years ago

      Very good - I have seen this tried and true method over the years, but did not know what it was called. Indian Mathematics does not always get the credit it deserves !

    • profile image

      yashvi..... 3 years ago

      I like this techniques n it made ne easy to do maths thxx .......

    • profile image

      priya 4 years ago

      very very thanx for this special techniques........................

    • profile image

      monu 4 years ago

      thik hai

    • profile image

      gautam 4 years ago

      superb and cool. i like this

    • profile image

      sreevidya 4 years ago

      this is good view learn some more tips

    • profile image

      sreevidya 4 years ago

      this is good view learn some more tips

    • profile image

      iswariya 4 years ago

      i really love vedic maths tricks. the joy i had while practising it cannot be expressed in words first i felt calculating is hard but vedic maths tricks had made easier

    • profile image

      mishan 007 4 years ago

      nice and the best technique

    • profile image

      aman ahmed 4 years ago

      awesome better than other examples

    • profile image

      manu 4 years ago

      excellent

    • profile image

      swati kandoi 4 years ago

      thanku....its good

    • profile image

      Swati 4 years ago

      great..thankyou

    • profile image

      bhanu kumar 4 years ago

      exellent and super-duper

    • profile image

      ZZZZZZZZZZZZZZ 4 years ago

      AGREE WITH MAK KIDSTUFF

    • profile image

      santosh 5 years ago

      nice........

    • profile image

      raghav 5 years ago

      amazing for multiplication

    • profile image

      vishwanath 5 years ago

      ds z so esy 10nk....

    • profile image

      janavi 5 years ago

      This is amazing but don't know how you say -2-3= 06 because -2-3=5 and we put this is your method 05 but why you put 06 ? tell me

    • profile image

      Praveen 5 years ago

      Really cool .

    • profile image

      sanjeevi 5 years ago

      it is very usefull for me

    • profile image

      Girikanth 5 years ago

      Amasing techiniques. I realy had a fun.

    • profile image

      jag mohan parnami 5 years ago

      this is really wonderful method to multiply. you may live long. and create new method of multiplication .

      thanks

    • profile image

      gajendra bohara 5 years ago

      it think that the easy the calculate fast

    • profile image

      simran 5 years ago

      its so easy and gud. thanku so so much

    • profile image

      sakshi 5 years ago

      it is really helpful ............................

      awesome

    • profile image

      ASHUTOSH 5 years ago

      It is very nice & excellent. THANKS???????

    • profile image

      shahid 5 years ago

      very good, easy

    • profile image

      madhumitha 5 years ago

      WOW THIS IS VERY EASY

    • profile image

      aishwarya 5 years ago

      really good .very useful in exam and can save time

    • profile image

      poohf@rocketmail.com 5 years ago

      It's a very easy trick. I am so proud that India has created this vedic maths method.

    • profile image

      SUDHEER 5 years ago

      REALLY ITS BETTER TRICK

    • profile image

      grangden...... 5 years ago

      bravo......thanks ..........alot

    • profile image

      namrata 5 years ago

      its really good technique

    • profile image

      lucy maureen 5 years ago

      a nice one we would like to create our own account help us pliz

    • profile image

      sandeep 5 years ago

      its a realy good

    • profile image

      savi 5 years ago

      its really too good

    • profile image

      Liyaqat Mirza 5 years ago

      Its very nice technique to solve multiplication of numbers.

      Thanks for sharing.

    • profile image

      Sushil 5 years ago

      Amazing multiplication . . .

    • profile image

      Bittu chandra. 5 years ago

      It is an awesome methode also very interesting and useful

    • profile image

      Amish 5 years ago

      Very nice technique

    • profile image

      N .SREE HARSHA 5 years ago

      IT IS VERY NICE. I WANT TO LEARN SOME MORE TECHNIQUES

    • profile image

      sridh 5 years ago

      it's very good

    • profile image

      yashvir 5 years ago

      u r great....

    • profile image

      ANURAG CHAKRABORTY 5 years ago

      very very very very niceeeee

      i loved it

    • profile image

      abhi 5 years ago

      it's so easy i have already learnt this and i can tell this answer in less than 4 seconds....

    • profile image

      Santos 5 years ago

      it is easy

    • profile image

      deepthi 5 years ago

      in less time we get answer

    • profile image

      shiv 6 years ago

      its really wonderful

    • profile image

      jenny 6 years ago

      very good ... it's very nice

    • profile image

      Ates 6 years ago

      Waow....its awesome so easy 2 calculate....thanks

    • profile image

      simran 6 years ago

      very easy it is also in our school it make to do it very easily calculation

    • profile image

      Megha shyam 6 years ago

      It's really good

    • profile image

      NAGARAJU 6 years ago

      GOOD ONE & USEFUL

    • profile image

      sourabh 6 years ago

      nice one plz publish the 2nd part.

    • profile image

      sanjay 6 years ago

      best

    • profile image

      ashish chawda 6 years ago

      its really awesome.............

    • profile image

      Mak 6 years ago

      Kid Stuff

      13X12=(13+2)||(3*2)

      =15||6

      =156

      || is a concatenation operator, just joining the left and right parts

      47 x 42 =

      add 47+2 = 49

      now our base is 10, 47 is (4 times 10) + 7

      so 4x49=196

      and 7 x 2 (unit place digits of both numbers) =14

      concatenate these two ,4x49||7x2

      =196||14

      since its going to be a 4-digit number.

      hence concatenating we get 19(6+1)4 = 1974

      Piece of cake! You can do this mentally.

    • profile image

      ankur ajmani 6 years ago

      great tricks... thanks...

    • profile image

      Shashank 6 years ago

      REALLY COOL, NICE & AWESOME

      Very easy to do Maths NOW

    • profile image

      Rajeev 6 years ago

      Thanks you sir this will help me in bank exams.

    • profile image

      Ayush 6 years ago

      This is really an interesting and intelligent way to do the mathematical calculations and is really important for 10+ students.

    • profile image

      manz 6 years ago

      its amazing and really helpful!!!

    • BkCreative profile image

      BkCreative 6 years ago from Brooklyn, New York City

      Brilliant - thanks so much for laying this out here - so I can look at it and do it. I am a big fan of Vedic math. Yay!

      Rated up and great to meet you. I will follow!

    • profile image

      manoj 6 years ago

      this is amazing keep trying like this more which will be useful for us

    • profile image

      purnaa 6 years ago

      Need more clarity as well as uniformaty.........

    • profile image

      Barbie 6 years ago

      It is really magical and very helpful.. This is awesome.. Thanks for help!! U rock!!

    • profile image

      ara 6 years ago

      i hope you will find a formula that will apply to all and does not limit as to same digits in the left or ending in 5...as in all

    • profile image

      anjiIIITR 6 years ago

      it's nice

    • profile image

      Jiten 6 years ago

      Excellent

    • profile image

      abhi 6 years ago

      wow its most useful...........

    • profile image

      shah alam 6 years ago

      good but how can i multiple any number above 100 and less than

    • profile image

      Shrey 6 years ago

      really good. can multiply really fast now. useful for my exams

    • profile image

      rahul 6 years ago

      nice

    • profile image

      Dave 6 years ago

      @Allan. This technique works for 13x12. The issue you are having is 13x12 doesn't satisfy the condition that the ones places must add to ten. Convert 13x12 to (18-5)x12 as suggested in the last lines of the technique and you will get the correct answer of 156.

    • profile image

      MARC 6 years ago

      I LIKE THIS TRICKS VERY GOOD

    • profile image

      divya dwivedi 6 years ago

      very good

    • profile image

      Rahul 6 years ago

      I don't usually comment on posts but this one is really great. Thanx...and post more links on multiplication techniques please...

    • profile image

      allan 6 years ago

      not all can used this techniques try to Multiply this 13 x 12 if you will used the above you will arrived wrong answer. 13x12 using above techniques is 206 but the real answer is 156

    • profile image

      vishu 6 years ago

      its good

    • profile image

      ATUL 7 years ago

      THANX VERY MUCH FOR THE RULE.ITS REALLY AMAZING ND I LKE IT VRY MUCH

    • profile image

      Madan 7 years ago

      Multiply made easy, its really amazing

    • profile image

      shormi 7 years ago

      this is really amazing but i wud like to see all d rules.....

    • profile image

      saif 7 years ago

      awesome methods! very helpful for students facing board exams

    • profile image

      teenu ktjm , idamattom 7 years ago

      nice and very good

    • profile image

      GOPIKA 7 years ago

      WOW!IT IS A NICE METHOD.VERY EASY!

    • profile image

      Nafees 7 years ago

      Wow really nice

    • profile image

      tre 7 years ago

      this is cool

    • profile image

      Jake Anderson 7 years ago

      Thanks For helping me in my homework =)

    • profile image

      shiva kumar 7 years ago

      This video is very useful

    • profile image

      suniiya 7 years ago

      really gud

    • profile image

      sanu 7 years ago

      these vedic tricks are good but not online